Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore Police Department - Reporting on Vehicle Accidents
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Baltimore Police Department to require responding law enforcement officers to complete certain accident reports for vehicle accidents; requiring an accident report to contain information about the cause of the accident, the conditions at the time of the accident, identification of the persons and vehicles involved in the accident, and any damage to public property or infrastructure; and requiring the Baltimore Police Department to provide a copy of each accident report to certain departments in Baltimore City.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore Police Department - Reporting on Vehicle Accidents
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Baltimore Police Department - Reporting on Vehicle Accidents
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM