Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals
Sponsored by
Senators Hettleman, Hester, Kagan, and Pinsky
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 440
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a certain person that generates food residuals to separate the food residuals from other solid waste and ensure that the food residuals are diverted from final disposal in a refuse disposal system in a certain manner; applying the requirements of the Act to certain persons that generate certain amounts of food residuals; authorizing a person experiencing undue hardship because of the costs of diverting food residuals to apply for a certain waiver; requiring the Department of the Environment to issue a certain warning; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0264
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {324433/1 Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {640111/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-40)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 440
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals
Senate 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments {324433/1 Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2021 3/11/2021 Referred Environment and Transportation 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments {640111/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (95-40) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 440
Text - Chapter - Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:02 PM
Click to return on the top page