Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Liens - Expiration
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson and Miller
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that certain tax liens on certain real property or certain personal property terminate 20 years after the date of assessment; increasing, from 4 to 20, the number of years that a lien for unpaid inheritance tax continues under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tax Liens - Expiration
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {709030/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Tax Liens - Expiration
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-1)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Tax Liens - Expiration
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Tax Liens - Expiration
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {709030/1 Adopted 47A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Tax Liens - Expiration
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Ways and Means 50
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-1) 61
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Text - Chapter - Tax Liens - Expiration
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-806 )
(   14-804 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM