Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Employees’ and Teachers’ Retirement and Pension Systems – Reemployment – Clarification
Sponsored by
Senator Peters
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 561
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that a reemployed retiree of the Employees' and Teachers' Retirement System or the Employees' and Teachers' Pension System is subject to a certain reduction in their retirement allowance if the retiree's compensation is derived from certain State funds; requiring the funding for a reemployed retiree's position to be funded from a non-State source that specifically requires the use of the grant funds to pay the full amount of the compensation of the position to qualify for a certain exemption; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate M. Jackson) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {623220/1 (Delegate M. Jackson) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 561
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 9:00 a.m.
Text - First - Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment - Clarification
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable Adopted 35
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment - Clarification
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 37
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Appropriations 38
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate M. Jackson) Adopted 51
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Floor Amendment {623220/1 (Delegate M. Jackson) Adopted 51
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 51
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Employees’ and Teachers’ Retirement and Pension Systems – Reemployment – Clarification
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 561
Text - Chapter - Employees’ and Teachers’ Retirement and Pension Systems – Reemployment – Clarification
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:07 PM