Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Services - Youth Services Bureaus - Funding
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Augustine, and King
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that the Department of Human Services identify eligible youth services bureaus and estimate the amount of State funds to allocate to each youth services bureau; requiring State matching funds for a youth services bureau to be paid directly to its private sponsor; requiring the Governor to include at least $1,800,000 in the annual budget bill for youth services bureaus; providing for the allocation of the required funds; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0709
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Human Services - Youth Services Bureaus - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Human Services - Youth Services Bureaus - Funding
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/14/2020 10:40 AM