Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying Information
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Astle, Brochin, Currie, Eckardt, Feldman, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Lee, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Robinson, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a court to provide the Secretary of Health with identifying information regarding an individual who has been convicted under certain provisions of law of the murder, attempted murder, or manslaughter of a child; requiring the Department of Human Services, in coordination with the Vital Statistics Administration, to contract with an independent organization to develop a data collection process in order to assess the effectiveness of certain required record sharing in predicting and preventing child abuse and neglect; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0454
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {328273/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {822817/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying Information
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying Information
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Child Abuse and Neglect - Disclosure of Identifying Information and Investigations
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Favorable with Amendments {328273/1 Adopted 31
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Text - Third - Child Abuse and Neglect - Disclosure of Identifying Information and Investigations
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 33
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Referred Judiciary 34
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable with Amendments {822817/1 Adopted 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying Information
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Text - Chapter - Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying Information
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-715 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM