Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - State Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsored by
Senators Kramer and Hayes
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for the first $5,000 of income earned by law enforcement officers to include a law enforcement officer who is a member of the Maryland Transportation Authority Police or any other State law enforcement unit and who resides in a political subdivision in which the crime rate exceeds the State's crime rate; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0843
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - State Law Enforcement Officers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {609539/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - State Law Enforcement Officers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - State Law Enforcement Officers
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {609539/1 Adopted 35
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - State Law Enforcement Officers
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 37
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Ways and Means 38
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:07 PM