Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Organizational Licenses
Sponsored by
Calvert County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 513
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing an organizational license in Calvert County; authorizing the license to be issued to a fraternal organization, volunteer fire department, or volunteer rescue squad for use on specified premises; authorizing the licensee to sell beer, wine, and liquor by the drink for consumption on the licensed premises only; and providing for an annual license fee of $500.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {774936/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Special Order until next session (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 513
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments {774936/1 Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 43
House 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Second Reading Passed 66
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Special Order until next session (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 68
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 69
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 513
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM