Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development Programs - Data Collection and Tracking - Minority Business Enterprises
Sponsored by
Senators Griffith, Augustine, Elfreth, Guzzone, Hayes, McCray, and Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - Favorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Commerce in a certain annual report on economic development programs to include information for minority business enterprises on the number of enterprises that received assistance from each economic development program and the percentage of assistance distributed to each minority business enterprise from each economic development program compared to the total assistance distributed from each economic development program.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0404
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Economic Development Programs - Data Collection and Tracking - Minority Business Enterprises
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/17/2020 11:58 AM