Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Events, Licensing, Alcohol Awareness Requirements, and Fines
Sponsored by
Senators Young and Hough
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Restricting the number of bottles of wine that may remain open at any one time at a wine sampling or tasting event in Frederick County to all bottles in a wine preservation system that the Board of License Commissioners approves and not more than six other bottles; altering the qualifications for signatories of a certificate accompanying a license application; providing for an alternative method for selecting signatories under specified circumstances; authorizing the Board to reduce a suspension under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0273
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {264138/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2015 3/05/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments {264138/1 Report Adopted 37
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37
Senate 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 39
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 First Reading Economic Matters 41
House 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-103, 13-101, 16-507, 8-406.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM