Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Administration and Funding
Sponsored by
Senators Griffith and Hershey
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 403
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Transferring oversight of the Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants from the Maryland Higher Education Commission to the Maryland Department of Health; requiring the Department to submit a certain annual report to the General Assembly; requiring the Comptroller to distribute $1,000,000 from the Board of Physicians Fund to the Program if the Governor does not include at least $1,000,000 in the State budget in fiscal year 2022 for the Program; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0998
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {284034/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {434363/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 403
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Administration and Funding
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {284034/1 Adopted 43
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Administration and Funding
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 45
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Appropriations 46
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {434363/1 Adopted 49B
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49B
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 50
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Administration and Funding
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 403
Text - Chapter - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Administration and Funding
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-1701, 24-1701 through 24-1706, 24-1702, 24-1704, 24-1705, 24-1706, 24-1707 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 1:56 PM