Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Brewery Promotion Program - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt, Bailey, Edwards, Gallion, Hershey, Hough, Peters, Salling, Washington, and West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Brewery Promotion Program in the Department of Commerce to provide grants and to conduct certain activities to promote the creation and development of Maryland breweries, visits to Maryland breweries, and the production and consumption of Maryland beer; requiring an applicant to meet certain requirements to qualify for participation in the Program; establishing the Maryland Brewery Promotion Fund to provide certain grants; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0480
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0956 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing canceled (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing canceled (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Brewery Promotion Program - Establishment
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing canceled (Finance)
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing canceled (Finance)
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1701 through 5-1705 )
(   2-301, 5-105 )
Last Updated: 1/16/2020 1:05 PM