Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend Property (Castle Doctrine)
Sponsored by
Senators Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Gallion, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Ready, Salling, Serafini, and Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing that an occupant of a dwelling is justified in using any degree of physical force against another person, including deadly physical force, when the other person has made an unlawful entry into the dwelling, the occupant reasonably believes that force or deadly force is necessary to repel an attack, and the amount and nature of the force used by the occupant are reasonable under the circumstances; establishing that a person acting in accordance with the Act is immune from certain criminal prosecution; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend Property (Castle Doctrine)
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/25/2020 11:53 AM