Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Government Shutdowns - Employees - Protections
Sponsored by
Senators Ellis, Augustine, Bailey, Beidle, Benson, Carozza, Carter, Elfreth, Feldman, Ferguson, Griffith, Guzzone, Hayes, Hester, Jennings, Kagan, King, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lam, Lee, McCray, Miller, Nathan-Pulliam, Patterson, Peters, Pinsky, Reilly, Rosapepe, Smith, Waldstreicher, Washington, West, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a public service company from terminating electric or gas service to certain residential customers for nonpayment on a day that a government shutdown is in effect and for 7 days after the government shutdown has ended; authorizing the Public Service Commission to adopt certain regulations; requiring a certain court to stay certain proceedings for the foreclosure or repossession of certain residential property for a certain period of time under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1318
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance and Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Government Shutdowns - Employees - Protections
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {227275/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Government Shutdowns - Employees - Protections
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-5)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
4/06/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-32)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Government Shutdowns - Employees - Protections
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance and Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Government Shutdowns - Employees - Protections
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {227275/1 Adopted 47A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Government Shutdowns - Employees - Protections
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (41-5) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Economic Matters Environment and Transportation 50
House 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2019 4/06/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (107-32) 66
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522
Text - Chapter - Government Shutdowns - Employees - Protections
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105.1, 8-401 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM