Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Information Act - Required Denials - Distribution Lists
Sponsored by
Senator Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a custodian to deny inspection under the Public Information Act of only the part of a distribution list that identifies a physical address, an e-mail address, or a telephone number of an individual that is used by a governmental entity or an elected official for the sole purpose of periodically sending news about certain official activities or emergency alerts; defining "distribution list" as a list of recipients who have affirmatively opted to receive information or alerts; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0717
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Information Act - Required Denials - Distribution Lists
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2020
Legislative Date
2/12/2020
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Information Act - Required Denials - Distribution Lists
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/12/2020 2/12/2020 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/25/2020 11:53 AM