Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions - Depository Institutions - Savings Promotion Raffles
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Kelley, Mathias, Pugh, and Reilly
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which specified depository institutions may conduct a savings promotion raffle; repealing a requirement that a depository institution that offers a savings promotion raffle must post in specified locations and disclose in specified materials a specified statement describing the terms and conditions of the raffle; repealing a requirement that the Commissioner of Financial Regulation must approve a savings promotion raffle conducted by a banking institution; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0558
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {137070/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2015 3/05/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments {137070/1 Report Adopted 37
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37
Senate 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 39
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 First Reading Economic Matters 41
House 4/01/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 59
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-305 )
(   12-106 )
(   1-101, 1-211, 6-716 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM