Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Baltimore Convention Facility - Operating Deficits
Sponsored by
Senator Jones-Rodwell (By Request - Baltimore City Administration) and Senators Conway, Ferguson, McFadden, and Pugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the period during which the Maryland Stadium Authority and Baltimore City must contribute a specified amount to the annual operating deficits of the Baltimore Convention facility and extending to December 31, 2019, the date after which Baltimore City is solely responsible for all operating deficits and capital improvements for the Baltimore Convention facility.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0525
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {159736/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Special Order until next session (Delegate Barkley) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {564962/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (103-36)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments {159736/1 Report Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 First Reading Appropriations 47
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Special Order until next session (Delegate Barkley) Adopted 60
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Floor Committee Amendment {564962/1 Adopted 60A
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60A
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (103-36) 62
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendment 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Passed Enrolled 61A
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM