Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities – Electricity and Natural Gas Suppliers – Information
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman and Hershey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission to establish customer choice shopping websites for electric and natural gas customers; requiring the Commission to use information from electric and natural gas suppliers to maintain the information on the websites; requiring each electricity or natural gas supplier that is actively seeking residential customers in a service territory in the State to maintain at least one open offer on the Commission's website at all times; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0689
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electricity - Customer Choice - Education
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {657076/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 04/02 (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Electricity - Customer Choice - Education
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {657076/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Public Utilities – Electricity and Natural Gas Suppliers – Information
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Economic Matters 47
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Motion Special Order until 04/02 (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted 56
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Text - Chapter - Public Utilities – Electricity and Natural Gas Suppliers – Information
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-501, 7-510.1, 7-510.2, 7-604.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM