Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Beidle, Benson, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, Feldman, Ferguson, Griffith, Guzzone, Hayes, Hershey, Jennings, Kagan, King, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lam, Lee, Patterson, Pinsky, Reilly, Rosapepe, Serafini, Washington, West, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council; repealing the requirement that the Secretary of Health and the Secretary of Aging, or their designees, cochair the Council; requiring the members of the Council to select the chair; requiring the Council to update a certain plan, examine the needs of individuals with Alzheimer's disease and identify methods to meet those needs, provide certain advice to the Governor and the General Assembly, and develop and promote certain strategies; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0571
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {217071/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {106089/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments {217071/1 Adopted 38
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Text - Third - Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 42
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments {106089/1 Adopted 53A
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53A
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 54
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 56
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Text - Chapter - Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3201 through 13-3203, 13-3204, 13-3205, 13-3206, 13-3207 )
(   2013, 2016 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM