Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Building Lifelong Library Learners Act
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth, Augustine, Bailey, Beidle, Benson, Carter, Ellis, Feldman, Griffith, Guzzone, Hayes, Hester, Kagan, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lam, Lee, Patterson, Peters, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Serafini, Smith, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, Washington, West, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a public library from charging a minor a replacement fine or fee for an overdue library book until 3 months after the date on which the library book was due; requiring a public library to cancel or return a certain replacement fine or fee if a book is returned; altering the calculation of certain funding for the State Library Research Center; requiring the Governor to include $7,500,000 in fiscal year 2022 and each fiscal year thereafter in the annual operating or capital budget for county library capital projects; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1000
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Building Lifelong Library Learners Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {874935/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Building Lifelong Library Learners Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-8)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted (125-10)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-13)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Building Lifelong Library Learners Act
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {874935/1 Adopted 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Building Lifelong Library Learners Act
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (38-8) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Referred Ways and Means 51
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted (125-10) 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (122-13) 52
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-110 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2020 10:21 AM