Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Authorizing Agent
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that a certain document through the execution of which a certain individual may decide the disposition of the individual's own body without certain consent includes a document designating a person to act as an authorizing agent; providing that an authorizing agent is bound by certain documents in making certain decisions; and clarifying the order of priority of persons that have the right to serve as the authorizing agent for a decedent.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1229
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Authorizing Agent
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Authorizing Agent
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Authorizing Agent
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable Adopted 42
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Second Reading Passed 42
Text - Third - Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Authorizing Agent
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 44
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 49B
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:48 AM