Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Education – Membership – Teacher and Parent Members
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker, Guzzone, King, Lee, McCray, Nathan-Pulliam, Pinsky, Smith, and Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 577
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the State Board of Education to add a certain certified teacher who is actively teaching and a parent of a student enrolled in a public school in the State; requiring the Governor to appoint a certain teacher member with the advice and consent of the Senate after an election by teachers in the State; requiring the Governor to appoint a certain parent member with the advice and consent of the Senate from a certain list submitted by the Maryland PTA; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0087
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0739 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Education - Membership - Teachers and Parent
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {514532/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Board of Education – Membership – Teacher and Parent Members
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-5)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-41)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 577
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Board of Education - Membership - Teachers and Parent
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments {514532/1 Adopted 59A
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59A
Text - Third - State Board of Education – Membership – Teacher and Parent Members
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (39-5) 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 60
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (97-41) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 577
Text - Chapter - State Board of Education – Membership – Teacher and Parent Members
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM