Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance Law - Application to Direct Primary Care Agreements - Exclusion
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining a "direct primary care agreement" as a written contract in which a primary care provider agrees to provide certain primary care services to a patient for a certain fee and for a certain period of time and that has certain elements; excluding a direct primary care agreement from certain definitions for the purpose of certain provisions of insurance law; and providing that certain provisions of insurance law do not apply to a direct primary care agreement.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0718
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Insurance Law - Application to Direct Primary Care Agreements - Exclusion
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-103, 1-101, 11-601, 14-101.1, 15-101, 18-101, 31-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM