Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership - Correctional Case Management Specialist
Sponsored by
Senator McFadden
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Correctional Officers' Retirement System to include specified correctional case management specialists, supervisors, or managers; providing that specified members of the Correctional Officers' Retirement System who meet specified criteria may receive a normal service retirement allowance that is based on specified creditable service; requiring the State Retirement Agency, on or before October 1, 2016, to notify specified individuals affected by the Act of their right to transfer specified service credit; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1438
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0488 Session: 2010 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {289935/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/28/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable with Amendments {289935/1 Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 56
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM