Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Formation of Domestic Insurers - Number of Directors
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Beidle, Benson, Feldman, Hayes, and Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reducing to 5 the minimum number of members of the board of directors that a domestic financial guaranty insurance company that is prohibited from issuing new policies must have on its board of directors.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0529
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance - Formation of Domestic Insurers - Number of Directors
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Insurance - Formation of Domestic Insurers - Number of Directors
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Formation of Domestic Insurers - Number of Directors
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Insurance - Formation of Domestic Insurers - Number of Directors
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable Adopted 44
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Insurance - Formation of Domestic Insurers - Number of Directors
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46A
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Economic Matters 46A
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 59
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Formation of Domestic Insurers - Number of Directors
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM