Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Assembly - Legislative Newsletters - Publication Expenses and Links to Social Media Accounts
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards (Chair, Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics) and Senators Feldman, Griffith, Hershey, King, and Klausmeier
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 563
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that publication expenses related to unofficial legislative newsletters may be paid by an authorized candidate campaign committee, rather than a campaign account of a campaign finance entity, of an incumbent under certain circumstances; providing that an official electronic legislative newsletter may include a link to a social media account only under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0701
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {734333/1
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {734333/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
42A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (131-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-1)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 563
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - General Assembly - Legislative Newsletters - Publication Expenses and Links to Social Media Accounts
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Favorable with Amendments {734333/1 39
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 39
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Favorable with Amendments {734333/1 Adopted 40
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - General Assembly - Legislative Newsletters - Publication Expenses and Links to Social Media Accounts
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 42
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 42A
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 10:00 a.m.
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Hearing canceled
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (131-0) 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-1) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 563
Text - Chapter - General Assembly - Legislative Newsletters - Publication Expenses and Links to Social Media Accounts
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:15 PM