Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
**Veto override
   SB0537 - 2019RS
   CH0001 - 2020RS
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Rates - Exemptions
Sponsored by
Senators Lam, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Carter, Ellis, Feldman, Ferguson, Griffith, Guzzone, Hayes, Kagan, Kelley, King, Kramer, Lee, McCray, Nathan-Pulliam, Patterson, Peters, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Smith, Waldstreicher, Washington, Young, and Zucker
Status
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2020
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which certain individuals are exempt from paying the out-of-state tuition rate at public institutions of higher education; altering the circumstances under which certain individuals are eligible to pay the resident tuition rate at a public senior higher education institution or the in-county rate at a community college; requiring certain individuals to retain a certain tuition status until the individual is awarded a certain degree under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0262
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0546 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Higher Education - Tuition Rates - Exemptions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Higher Education - Tuition Rates - Exemptions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-38)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/22 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/30 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Veto overridden (31-15)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Veto overridden (95-43)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2020
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Higher Education - Tuition Rates - Exemptions
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Adopted 43
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed 43
Text - Third - Higher Education - Tuition Rates - Exemptions
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 45A
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Appropriations 46
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Third Reading Passed (92-38) 53
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/22 (Senator King) Adopted
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/30 (Senator King) Adopted
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Veto overridden (31-15)
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Veto overridden (95-43)
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2020
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-106.8 )
Last Updated: 2/12/2020 10:19 AM