Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Forfeiture of Benefits
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman and Ferguson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that specified public employees who are specified State officers may be subject to forfeiture of benefits from the State Retirement and Pension System; prohibiting the payment of benefits to a public employee who is found guilty of, pleads guilty to, or enters a plea of nolo contendere to a qualifying crime; prohibiting the forfeiture of benefits if the forfeiture negatively affects or invalidates the tax qualified status of any of several systems within the State Retirement and Pension System; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 9, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {379131/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {379131/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Appropriations 51
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2016 4/01/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 4/01/2016 4/01/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-502, 21-701 through 21-709 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM