Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Ellis, Kagan, Lam, Lee, Nathan-Pulliam, Patterson, Smith, and Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 760
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that a summary of each nutrient management plan be filed and updated with the Department of Agriculture at certain times; authorizing the Department to require an updated summary to take the form of an annual implementation report; requiring a manure broker to provide certain information to a certain person; requiring a person who holds a certain certificate or license to comply with certain reporting requirements and deadlines related to implementation of the Phosphorus Management Tool; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0904
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {604032/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {310911/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-41)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Young and Kagan)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Young and Kagan)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Lafferty, Stein and Lehman)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Lafferty, Stein and Lehman)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {133528/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (24-15)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {133528/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-40)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 760
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {604032/1 Adopted 44
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 46A
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 46A
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments {310911/1 Adopted 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (95-41) 57
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 60
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 60
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Young and Kagan) 60
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 62
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 62
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Young and Kagan) 62
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 House Refuses Recede 62
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Lafferty, Stein and Lehman) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 House Refuses Recede 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Lafferty, Stein and Lehman) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Conference Committee Report {133528/1 Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (24-15) 62A
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Conference Committee Report {133528/1 Adopted 64
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (93-40) 64
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 760
Text - Chapter - Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-801.1, 8-803, 8-803.1, 8-807 )
(   9-301, 9-323, 9-325 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM