Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Baltimore Region - Baltimore Metropolitan Council and Advisory Board and Baltimore Region Transportation Board
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, Feldman, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Pugh, and Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Altering the purposes of the Baltimore Metropolitan Council; altering the membership of the Council; requiring the Council to make a specified report annually to the General Assembly; repealing provisions of law that establish the Baltimore Metropolitan Council Advisory board; establishing the Baltimore Region Transportation Board; providing for the purpose and composition of the Board; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0172
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {207977/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/05/2014 3/06/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Favorable with Amendments {207977/1 Report Adopted 41
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 42
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 45
House 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 61
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-301, 13-302, 13-303, 13-304, 13-305, 13-306, 13-307, 13-308, 13-309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM