Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - 45th District - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 License
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to issue a Class B-D-7 license in the 4800 block of Harford Road in the 45th alcoholic beverages district if the applicant meets certain requirements.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0868
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Baltimore City - 45th District - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 License
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - 45th District - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D-7 License
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 28AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Referred Economic Matters 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2021 3/28/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Returned Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:17 PM
Click to return on the top page