Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Dispensing of Drugs Under a Delegation Agreement
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker and Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the required contents of a certain delegation agreement in order for a primary supervising physician to delegate to a certain physician assistant the dispensing of certain substances, drugs, and devices; prohibiting a primary supervising physician from delegating the dispensing of certain controlled dangerous substances identified as Schedule I; authorizing a physician assistant, under certain circumstances, to personally prepare and dispense a drug that the assistant is authorized to prescribe; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0591
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {784038/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Dispensing of Drugs Under a Delegation Agreement
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Favorable with Amendments {784038/1 Adopted 31
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Dispensing of Drugs Under a Delegation Agreement
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (40-0) 33
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 34
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 61A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Text - Chapter - Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Dispensing of Drugs Under a Delegation Agreement
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101, 15-302.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM