Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
Sponsored by
Senator King
Status
In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing for a 10-year term for the renewal of a video lottery operation license; requiring a licensee to provide notice of intent to apply for renewal of the license 2 years before the expiration of a license; requiring the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission to renew a certain license unless the Commission finds that the licensee is no longer qualified; requiring the Commission, before denying an application, to provide a licensee an opportunity for a hearing; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable Adopted 47A
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed 47A
Text - Third - Video Lottery Operation License - Renewal
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Ways and Means 49
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:10 PM