Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - Massage Therapists - Authority to Regulate
Sponsored by
Senator Pinsky
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 761
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the county executive or any governing body of a county, after consultation with the State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners, to adopt certain ordinances or regulations relating to massage establishments; authorizing local health officers and local law enforcement to carry out certain provisions of law; authorizing law enforcement officers to demand proof of licensure or registration; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-9)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 761
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - Massage Therapists - Authority to Regulate
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Second Reading Passed 40
Text - Third - State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - Massage Therapists - Authority to Regulate
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42
House 3/11/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 43A
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (128-9) 59
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 761
Text - Chapter - State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - Massage Therapists - Authority to Regulate
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-405, 6-502 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM