Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Legislative and Executive Branches - Workplace Bullying
Sponsored by
Senators Miller, Augustine, Bailey, Beidle, Benson, Carozza, Carter, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, Ellis, Feldman, Ferguson, Gallion, Griffith, Guzzone, Hayes, Hershey, Hester, Hough, Jennings, Kagan, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lam, Lee, McCray, Nathan-Pulliam, Patterson, Peters, Pinsky, Ready, Reilly, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, Smith, Waldstreicher, Washington, West, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each manager and supervisor in the Legislative and Executive branches of State government to immediately report to the appointing authority or head of the principal unit certain incidents of workplace bullying; providing that it is the intent of the State to educate all employees about bullying, ensure that bullying is not tolerated, and deal appropriately with bullying in the workplace; requiring certain human resources departments to collect and share data on complaints and reports; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0057
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Government - Legislative and Executive Branches - Workplace Bullying
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 2-901 through 2-909 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM