Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law – Crime of Violence Against Pregnant Person – Enhanced Penalty (Laura and Reid’s Law)
Sponsored by
Senators Ready, Carozza, and Eckardt
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from committing a certain crime of violence against another person when the person knows or believes that the other person is pregnant; providing that a person who violates the Act is guilty of a felony and, in addition to any other penalty imposed for the underlying crime of violence, on conviction is subject to imprisonment not exceeding 10 years; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0757
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law – Homicide – Fetus (Laura and Reid’s Law)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {838378/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {332611/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Zirkin, Hough and Ready)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Zirkin, Hough and Ready)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Clippinger, Atterbeary and Malone)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Clippinger, Atterbeary and Malone)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {823525/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {823525/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law – Homicide – Fetus (Laura and Reid’s Law)
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {838378/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law – Crime of Violence Against Pregnant Person – Enhanced Penalty (Laura and Reid’s Law)
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Judiciary 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {332611/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Zirkin, Hough and Ready) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Zirkin, Hough and Ready) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Refuses Recede 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Clippinger, Atterbeary and Malone) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Refuses Recede 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Clippinger, Atterbeary and Malone) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Conference Committee Report {823525/1 Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Conference Committee Report {823525/1 Adopted 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law – Crime of Violence Against Pregnant Person – Enhanced Penalty (Laura and Reid’s Law)
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law – Crime of Violence Against Pregnant Person – Enhanced Penalty (Laura and Reid’s Law)
(   14-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page