Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cosmetologist - Licensing Examination - Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Patterson, Benson, Griffith, and Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Decreasing from 1,380 to 1,200 the number of hours of training in a cosmetology school that a certain applicant for a cosmetology license must complete before the applicant may take a certain written examination; requiring cosmetology schools to administer a certain part of an examination to certain students; and requiring the State Board of Cosmetologists to adopt regulations to require cosmetology schools to administer a certain part of an examination and to provide the opportunity for certain remedial training to certain students.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1203
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Cosmetologist - Licensing Examination - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Cosmetologist - Licensing Examination - Requirements
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM