Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - High School Graduation Requirements - Students in Foster Care or Homeless Youth
Sponsored by
Senators Washington, Benson, Elfreth, Ellis, Hester, Lam, and Patterson
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a county board of education to waive certain high school graduation requirements that are in addition to high school graduation requirements established by the State Board of Education for a student in foster care or who is a homeless youth if while in grade 11 or 12 the student transfers into the local school system from a different system in the State; prohibiting a county board from waiving certain requirements if it makes a finding that the student is reasonably capable of completing certain graduation requirements; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0754
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {454730/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Education - High School Graduation Requirements - Students in Foster Care or Homeless Youth
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {454730/1 Adopted 43
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Education - High School Graduation Requirements - Students in Foster Care or Homeless Youth
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 45
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Ways and Means 46
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 52
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/6/2020 4:17 PM