Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup to Study Child Custody Court Proceedings Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence Allegations
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Zirkin, Smith, Carter, Cassilly, Hester, Hough, Ready, Waldstreicher, Washington, and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup to Study Child Custody Court Proceedings Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence Allegations; and requiring the Workgroup to study State child custody court proceedings involving child abuse or domestic violence allegations and make recommendations about how State courts could incorporate in court proceedings the latest science regarding the safety and well-being of children and other victims of domestic violence in interim and final reports to the Governor and General Assembly by December 1, 2019, and June 1, 2020.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {618476/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {362914/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, West and Cassilly)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, West and Cassilly)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
House Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Workgroup to Study Child Custody Court Decisions Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence Allegations
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {618476/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Text - Third - Workgroup to Study Child Custody Court Proceedings Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence Allegations
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53A
House 3/29/2019 4/01/2019 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments {362914/1 Adopted 62
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, West and Cassilly) 63
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, West and Cassilly) 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 House Recede 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 67
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Text - Chapter - Workgroup to Study Child Custody Court Proceedings Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence Allegations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM