Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Rape Kit Testing Grant Fund - Established
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth, King, Ferguson, Eckardt, Edwards, Guzzone, Griffith, McCray, Peters, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 509
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Rape Kit Testing Grant Fund to provide law enforcement agencies with funding to pay for testing of sexual assault evidence collection kits by forensic laboratories; requiring the Executive Director of the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to administer the Fund and to establish and publish procedures for the distribution of funding; limiting the use of the funds to the equipment, supplies, personnel, and outsourcing necessary for the testing of sexual assault evidence collection kits; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1268
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Rape Kit Testing Grant Fund - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {838676/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {433229/1 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Rape Kit Testing Grant Fund - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 509
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Rape Kit Testing Grant Fund - Established
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Public Safety - Rape Kit Testing Grant Fund - Established
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {838676/1 Adopted 47A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator King) Adopted 47A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Floor Amendment {433229/1 (Senator King) Adopted 47A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Public Safety - Rape Kit Testing Grant Fund - Established
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Appropriations 50
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 61
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 509
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Rape Kit Testing Grant Fund - Established
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM