Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing – Sales Tax Sunset Extension and Study
Sponsored by
Senators McCray and Beidle
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 567
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending the termination provisions of law making sales and charges related to peer-to-peer car sharing subject to a certain sales and use tax rate; requiring the Department of Legislative Services to report to the General Assembly by December 31, 2020, on comparisons of certain taxes and fees in the State and in other states as they relate to short-term vehicle rental companies and peer-to-peer car sharing and any other information which may assist the General Assembly in determining equitable State taxation on certain services; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0841
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {599039/1
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {599039/1
Proceedings
38A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
38A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {599039/1
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Committee Amendment Withdrawn
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator McCray) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Substitute Committee Amendment {599039/2
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Substitute Committee Amendment {599039/2 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-7)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {495369/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (126-3)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-3)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-5)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 567
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Short-Term Rental Vehicles and Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing - Rate Alteration and Sunset Repeal
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable with Amendments {599039/1 38
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted 38
Senate 3/02/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable with Amendments {599039/1 38A
Senate 3/02/2020 2/28/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 38A
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments {599039/1 41
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Committee Amendment Withdrawn 41
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator McCray) Adopted 41
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments 41
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Substitute Committee Amendment {599039/2 41
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 41
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments 42
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Substitute Committee Amendment {599039/2 Adopted 42
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 42
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - Sales and Use Tax – Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing – Rate Alteration and Sunset Repeal
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (40-7) 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Ways and Means 44
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments {495369/1 Adopted 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (126-3) 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (128-3) 50
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (39-5) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing – Sales Tax Sunset Extension and Study
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 567
Text - Chapter - Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing – Sales Tax Sunset Extension and Study
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:11 PM