Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Sepsis Public Awareness Campaign Workgroup
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Jennings, Hershey, Mathias, Middleton, Oaks, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health to establish a Sepsis Public Awareness Campaign Workgroup; providing for the membership of the Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to develop a certain public awareness campaign, identify, review, and evaluate certain resources, and identify cost-effective methods for dissemination of certain information; and requiring the Workgroup to report to certain committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1467
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Sepsis Public Awareness Campaign Workgroup
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {577276/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Health - Sepsis Public Awareness Campaign Workgroup
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Sepsis Public Awareness Campaign Workgroup
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Health - Sepsis Public Awareness Campaign Workgroup
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {577276/1 Adopted 30
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Public Health - Sepsis Public Awareness Campaign Workgroup
Senate 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 32
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 33
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 55
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Sepsis Public Awareness Campaign Workgroup
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM