Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Commerce – Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer – Study
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Commerce to conduct a study in a certain manner on issues related to federal small business innovation research and technology transfer grants; and requiring the Department to report its findings and recommendations regarding financing options for grant recipients to the General Assembly by December 31, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1161
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {167774/1
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {167774/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {615362/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {167774/1 44
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 44
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments {167774/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Maryland Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer Incentive Program
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Ways and Means 50
House 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable with Amendments {615362/1 Adopted 66
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Department of Commerce – Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer – Study
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Text - Chapter - Department of Commerce – Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer – Study
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-102, 5-1701 through 5-1707 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM