Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
Sponsored by
Senator Hester
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to establish a certain stakeholder advisory group to develop a certain reading and dyslexia handbook; requiring the Department and the advisory stakeholder group to make a completed handbook available to the public by June 1, 2021, and to develop a list of recommended programs and materials that address certain needs; requiring the Department to update the handbook every 3 years; requiring the handbook and updates to be published and disseminated in a certain manner; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0718
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   1-101, 8-420 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:11 PM