Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Student Victim of Violent Crime - Option to Transfer or Require Offender to Transfer Schools
Sponsored by
Senator Salling
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a county superintendent of schools promptly to provide certain notice to a student who is the victim of a certain violent crime or a certain delinquent act committed by another student under certain circumstances; requiring a county superintendent, as determined by a certain victim or victim's representative, to transfer the victim or the offender to another school; requiring the State Board of Education to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0519 Session: 2008 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Student Victim of Violent Crime - Option to Transfer or Require Offender to Transfer Schools
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-303.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM