Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Nurse Practitioners - Certifications of Competency and Incapacity
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 568
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a requirement that a petition for guardianship of a disabled person include signed and verified certificates of competency by providing that the certificates may be signed and verified by a nurse practitioner and certain other health care practitioners; altering the requirements for the certification of a patient's incapacity to make an informed decision regarding treatment or of a patient's terminal or end-stage condition to allow the second individual making the certification to be a nurse practitioner; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0691
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {494733/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2020
Legislative Date
2/26/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
49BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 568
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Health Occupations - Nurse Practitioners - Certifications of Competency and Incapacity
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Favorable with Amendments {494733/1 Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2020 2/26/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Nurse Practitioners - Certifications of Competency and Incapacity
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 49BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 568
Text - Chapter - Health Occupations - Nurse Practitioners - Certifications of Competency and Incapacity
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:11 PM
Click to return on the top page