Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Application - Park Model Recreational Vehicles - Definition
Sponsored by
Senator Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a park model recreational vehicle is considered to be a travel trailer for the purposes of the Maryland Vehicle Law; defining the term "park model recreational vehicle"; and making specified conforming changes.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0922
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 54
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 56
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-1003, 14-2301 )
(   11-104 )
(   11-144.1, 11-170 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM