Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Leap Year - Personal Leave
Sponsored by
Senators Mathias, Astle, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, King, Lee, Manno, McFadden, Nathan-Pulliam, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Benson, and Oaks
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 680
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that each employee in the State Personnel Management System, except a temporary employee, is entitled to 7 days, not to exceed 56 hours, of personal leave with pay at the beginning of the first full pay period of the calendar year during a leap year.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0324
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Personnel - Leap Day Pay Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {567276/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Personnel - Leap Year - Personal Leave
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-42)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 680
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Personnel - Leap Year - Personal Leave
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Personnel - Leap Day Pay Act
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments {567276/1 Adopted 36
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
Text - Third - State Personnel - Leap Year - Personal Leave
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 38
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Referred Appropriations 40
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (96-42) 57
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 680
Text - Chapter - State Personnel - Leap Year - Personal Leave
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM