Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Weather-Related Claims
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an insurer from considering a claim for a weather-related event for the purpose of canceling or refusing to renew coverage for homeowner's insurance if the claim is for an amount of loss that is less than the insured's deductible under the policy or is resolved with no payout to the homeowner by the insurer.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0641
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2021
Legislative Date
1/31/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Homeowner's Insurance - Weather-Related Claims
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/31/2021 1/31/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Homeowner's Insurance - Weather-Related Claims
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 3/05/2021 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:17 PM
Click to return on the top page