Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Action for Change of Name - Waiver of Publication Requirement
Sponsored by
Senator Hettleman
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a court to waive a certain publication requirement in an action for change of name under the Maryland Rules on motion by an individual who has filed the action.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0039
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0387 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Action for Change of Name - Waiver of Publication Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Action for Change of Name - Waiver of Publication Requirement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-13)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
4/05/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-10)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Action for Change of Name - Waiver of Publication Requirement
Senate 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/22/2021 2/22/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/22/2021 2/22/2021 Hearing 2/26 at 10:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Favorable Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Second Reading Passed 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Action for Change of Name - Waiver of Publication Requirement
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (34-13) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Referred Judiciary 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 4/05/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (125-10) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Returned Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/8/2021 3:31 PM
Click to return on the top page